+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.369
On September 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.208
- Substituted For A1245a
On May 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.739
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1902a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Labor
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
May 2, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor