+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1191
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor