+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.430
On November 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.245
- Substituted For A7277a
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1869a
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.644
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2