+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A3563c
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1865b
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1286
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1865a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18