+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.860
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1853a
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1105
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 6
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor