+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.395
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.271
- Substituted For A7280a
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1118
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1848a
- Amend And Recommit To Elections
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor