+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.217
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
March 5, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor