+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1829a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor