+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A340b
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1829b
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1829a
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.119
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.397
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9
April 21, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 22, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9