+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1826b
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.248
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 1826a
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1124
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Procurement And Contracts
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 19, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Procurement And Contracts)
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Procurement And Contracts)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor