+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.756
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 14, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor