+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1384
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1261
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (6)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor