+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1041
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 2