+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.421
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.245
- Substituted For A9970b
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 177c
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.489
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.929
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 177b
- Amend And Recommit To Agriculture
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 177a
- Amend And Recommit To Agriculture
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
February 13, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 11
June 6, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor