+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.60
On November 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.748
- Substituted For A117c
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1765a
On March 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.196
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Disabilities
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Disabilities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor