+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1175
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1370
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 15
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 1, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor