+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.964
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.192
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
March 19, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor