+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.478
On September 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.450
- Substituted For A5180a
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1733a
On March 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.196
On January 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
January 24, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor