+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.388
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1726a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
February 11, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
May 21, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor