+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.223
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 12
March 5, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor