+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1188
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to labor
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to labor
+ − Vote
June 3, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Labor - Jun 3, 2014
- Yeas: 15
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Greg Ball: absent
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor