+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1126
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 17a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor