+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.147
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.107
- Substituted For A3546
On March 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.25
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
January 21, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor