+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.420
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.826
- Substituted For A330b
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 169b
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 169a
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.368
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor