+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 1688a
- Amend and recommit to elections
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.366
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
+ − Vote
April 22, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Elections - Apr 22, 2013
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea