+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.205
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1774
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (5)
June 13, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
June 15, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor