+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.307
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.402
- Substituted For A3892a
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.448
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1676a
- Amend And Recommit To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1855
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
+ − Votes (5)
June 7, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 13
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor