+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.296
- Delivered To Governor
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.329
- Substituted For A1877
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.378
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor