+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.281
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
February 2, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor