+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.703
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.431
- Substituted For A7112
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.312
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor