+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.93
On December 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.602
- Substituted For A4006
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1632
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor