+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1603a
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.963
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1345
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Higher Education
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (6)
June 1, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
February 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2