+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.341
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.120
- Substituted For A4000
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.893
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor