+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A1118
On March 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.633
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Racing, Gaming And Wagering
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Racing, Gaming And Wagering
+ − Vote
March 12, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor