+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.232
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.99
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 7
January 30, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor