+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.165
- Signed Chap.826
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.176
- Substituted For A4403
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.254
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1544a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 12
February 2, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9