+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1527c
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1527b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1527a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor