+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.462
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Vote
February 25, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor