+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.336
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 1472a
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.332
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 12, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 21, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor