+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 20, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On March 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.570
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 28, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.475
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
March 20, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
March 28, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 13, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor