+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.574
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor