+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.294
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
July 23, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
January 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor