+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.712
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.548
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
+ − Votes (5)
May 13, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Finance - May 13, 2014
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: present
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: nay
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
February 10, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Feb 10, 2014
- Yeas: 10
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
May 6, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Finance - May 6, 2013
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: present
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: present
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: absent
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Catharine Young: present
February 27, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Feb 27, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
February 27, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Feb 27, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea