+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary