+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.51
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
February 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1