+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A316
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.774
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
May 20, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor