+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.230
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.61
- Substituted For A1334
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.392
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor