+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.520
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.662
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1408a
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
May 13, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11