+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.876
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor