+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.372
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.566
- Substituted For A8234
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1852
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1349b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1349a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1